POULTRY WELFARE TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. To advance the education of the public in the keeping and breeding all types of poultry covering chickens, ducks, geese turkeys, guinea fowl, quail, pheasants, pigeons and otherdomestic and aviary birds. 2. To promote high standards and breeding of poultry. 3. To assist with the banning of the cruel practice of battery cages.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Animals
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 09 September 1997: Standard registration
- BEECH PUBLISHING HOUSE (Working name)
- WORLD BANTAM AND POULTRY SOCIETY LIMITED (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANTHONY BATTY | Trustee | 25 November 2014 |
|
|||||
ADRIAN WILKINS | Trustee | 25 November 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.32k | £5.30k | £5.50k | £4.87k | £4.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.22k | £4.63k | £4.98k | £4.24k | £3.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 19 MARCH 1997 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 18 AUGUST 1997 AND CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 30 MARCH 2009.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE HIGH STANDARDS AND BREEDING OF PURE-BRED POULTRY AND TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN THE SCIENCE OF POULTRY FARMING AND BREEDING
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 STATION YARD
ELSTED MARSH
MIDHURST
WEST SUSSEX
GU29 0JT
- Phone:
- 01730810989
- Email:
- BEECHPOULTRY@GMAIL.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window