THE SOMERSET ARMY CADET FORCE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Makes grants to adults and cadets of the Somerset Army Cadet Force to enhance the variety of activities on offer. In addition it supports cadets from less well off families to ensure that they are fully included in all activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Somerset
Governance
- 07 May 1997: Standard registration
- SOMERSET ACF TRUST (Working name)
- SOMERSET ARMY CADET FORCE TRUST (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mohammed Saddiq President | Trustee | 29 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Kendal | Trustee | 20 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Polly Marsh | Trustee | 25 February 2021 |
|
|||||
Brigadier Richard Toomey Chairman | Trustee | 12 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Biggart Trustee | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
GARRY PITHER | Trustee | 01 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
LORAINE MORGAN-BRINKHURST | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £868 | £10.68k | £738 | £822 | £768 | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.54k | £86 | £175 | £1.70k | £119 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 25 APRIL 1997 AS AMENDED BY DEED OF VARIATION DATED 10 NOVEMBER 1998 & RESOLUTION DATED 10 SEPTEMBER 2003.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY OF THE SOMERSET ARMY CADET FORCE (THE FORCE) IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Somerset Army Cadet Force
Jellalabad House
14 Mount Street
Taunton
TA1 3QE
- Phone:
- 01823284486
- Email:
- ceosomacf@wessex-rfca.mod.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window