JIGSAW4U LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Pre Bereavement and Grief Support Advocacy and befriending Home-school projects Participation Training and consultation Young Runaways and young people at risk of or expereincing sexual exploitation Domestic Abuse Early Years Parenting
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£1,312,515
Donations and legacies | £168.32k | |
Charitable activities | £1.13m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £18.56k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£1,088,056
Raising funds | £2.14k | |
Charitable activities | £1.09m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £207,847 from 4 government contract(s) and £17,000 from 1 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £2.14k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.09m | |
Retained for future use | £224.46k |
People

33 Employee(s)
9 Trustee(s)
120 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Croydon
- Kingston Upon Thames
- Merton
- Richmond Upon Thames
- Sutton
- Wandsworth
Governance
- 20 April 2005: Standard registration
- 10 March 2025: Funds received from 1102539 CLUSTERS
- MOVING FORWARD TOGETHER (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarita Brucciani | Chair | 03 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Martin Bransby Faiers | Trustee | 19 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Fox | Trustee | 15 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Beckwith | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Fleur Annabelle Raymond Laffont | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
EMANUELE BORMIDA | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Sarah Drury | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Amy Douthwaite | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Fraser Mcintosh Robert Hyland | Trustee | 06 December 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £950.76k | £1.07m | £1.07m | £1.27m | £1.31m | |
|
Total expenditure | £846.68k | £861.85k | £964.87k | £1.10m | £1.09m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £135.23k | £134.50k | £207.85k | |
|
Income from government grants | £57.50k | £59.63k | £186.62k | N/A | £17.00k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £101.68k | £74.56k | £66.22k | £88.87k | £168.32k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £847.29k | £990.64k | £1.00m | £1.18m | £1.13m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.79k | £593 | £91 | £0 | £18.56k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £3.37k | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £839.81k | £854.14k | £953.44k | £1.08m | £1.09m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £6.87k | £7.71k | £11.43k | £20.76k | £2.14k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £4.77k | £5.08k | £0 | £11.78k | £11.74k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £12.04k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £0 | £0 | £3.08k | £5.33k | £3.71k | |
|
Long-term investments | £46 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £674.02k | £936.84k | £1.00m | £1.15m | £1.38m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £35.71k | £94.54k | £58.29k | £45.43k | £52.31k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 05 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 05 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 16TH FEBRUARY 2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 14TH APRIL 2005
Charitable objects
3. THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (THE OBJECTS) ARE: I. TO RELIEVE THOSE CHILDREN AND ADULTS WHO HAVE SUFFERED SEXUAL, PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND EMOTIONAL DISTRESS BY THE PROVISION OF CARE, GUIDANCE, ADVICE, ADVOCACY AND COUNSELLING AS WELL AS THE PROVISION ADVICE AND SUPPORT FOR THOSE RESPONSIBLE FOR THE CARE OF SUCH PERSONS. II.TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF SOCIALLY OR ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED YOUNG PERSONS AND/OR THOSE WHO ARE EXCLUDED, OR IN DANGER OF BEING EXCLUDED, FROM SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF CARE, ADVICE, SUPPORT AND ADVOCACY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED, IN PRACTICE GREATER LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Jigsaw4u
40 Mill Green Road
Mitcham
CR4 4HY
- Phone:
- 0208 687 1384
- Email:
- info@jigsaw4u.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window