MARINE STEWARDSHIP COUNCIL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The MSC is a global non-profit organisation that recognises and rewards efforts to protect oceans and safeguard seafood supplies for the future. The MSC certification program contributes to the health of the oceans by rewarding sustainable fishing practices, influencing the choices people make when buying seafood, and working with partners to transform the seafood market to a sustainable basis.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£33,080,000
Donations and legacies | £906.00k | |
Charitable activities | £30.71m | |
Other trading activities | £694.00k | |
Investments | £773.00k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£31,366,000
Raising funds | £690.00k | |
Charitable activities | £30.68m | |
Other | £0 |
£1,563,000 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £690.00k | |
Charitable expenditure | £30.68m | |
Retained for future use | £1.71m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £690.00k | |
Charitable expenditure | £30.68m | |
Retained for future use | £3.28m |
People

247 Employee(s)
9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 25 |
£70k to £80k | 19 |
£80k to £90k | 13 |
£90k to £100k | 5 |
£100k to £110k | 3 |
£110k to £120k | 2 |
£120k to £130k | 2 |
£130k to £140k | 1 |
£140k to £150k | 3 |
£150k to £200k | 1 |
£250k to £300k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- City Of London
- Australia
- Belgium
- Canada
- Chile
- China
- Denmark
- Finland
- France
- Germany
- Hong Kong
- Iceland
- Indonesia
- Italy
- Japan
- Netherlands
- Norway
- Peru
- Poland
- Portugal
- Singapore
- South Africa
- South Korea
- Spain
- Sweden
- United States
Governance
- 10 December 1997: Standard registration
- MSC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Giles Bolton | Chair | 17 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Birgit Cameron | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
SERGIO ESPEJO YAKSIC | Trustee | 27 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr DARIAN MAY MCBAIN | Trustee | 27 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
MIKEL DURHAM | Trustee | 27 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
EDWARD NJOROGE | Trustee | 27 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kristjan Davidsson Th. | Trustee | 27 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Kevin Terrance Stokes | Trustee | 29 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Maria Damanaki | Trustee | 30 July 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.47m | £30.10m | £29.79m | £32.73m | £33.08m | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.91m | £27.24m | £28.67m | £30.57m | £31.37m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £4.38m | £3.46k | £2.41m | £2.27m | £906.00k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £859.00k | £604 | £507.00k | £621.00k | £694.00k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £23.73m | £25.62k | £26.13m | £29.05m | £30.71m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £497.00k | £416 | £744.00k | £795.00k | £773.00k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £26.30m | £26.79m | £28.05m | £29.83m | £30.68m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £616.00k | £452.00k | £621.00k | £741.00k | £690.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £316 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £82 | £96.00k | £95.00k | £102.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £455.80k | £4.86m | £5.08m | £4.81m | £4.58m | |
|
Long-term investments | £1.41m | £17.63m | £19.22m | £19.11m | £21.21m | |
|
Other assets | £1.79m | £19.99m | £21.26m | £22.36m | £23.62m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £370.30k | £3.67m | £4.85m | £4.15m | £4.14m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 11 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 07 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17 FEB 1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16 OCT 1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21 JUN 2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05 NOV 2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03 FEB 2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04 DEC 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03 MAR 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 29 OCT 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09 FEB 2021 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09 JUN 2023 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09 JUN 2023 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14 MAR 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS (THE "OBJECTS") ARE TO CONSERVE THE MARINE AND FRESHWATER ENVIRONMENTS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN THE PRINCIPLES AND PRACTICE OF CONSERVATION, PARTICULARLY. BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY . BY [A] CONSERVING MARINE AND FRESHWATER FISH POPULATIONS AND THE ENVIRONMENT ON WHICH THEY DEPEND; [B] PROMOTING FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT EFFECTIVE MANAGEMENT OF FISHERIES, AND ENSURING THE SUSTAINABILITY OF GLOBAL FISH STOCKS AND THE HEALTH OF AQUATIC ECOSYSTEMS GENERALLY; [C] ESTABLISHING AND PROMOTING THE APPLICATION OF A BROAD SET OF PRINCIPLES, STANDARDS AND CRITERIA FOR SUSTAINABLE FISHINGG
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Marine Stewardship Council
1-3 Snow Hill
London
EC1A 2DH
- Phone:
- 020 7246 8900
- Email:
- info@msc.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window