Accounts and annual returns WAVERTREE GARDEN SUBURB INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1067999
Charity reporting is up to date (11 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 11 February 2025 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 01 February 2024 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 01 February 2024 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 27 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 27 November 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 23 November 2022 296 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 23 November 2022 296 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 28 March 2021 56 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required