ASTHMA RELIEF

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision & maintenance of nebulisers and other specialist Medical breathing equipment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income includes £4,000 from 1 government contract(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 14 August 1997: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DR IAN MATHESON | Chair | 10 December 2014 |
|
|||||
KATARINA WARENSJO | Trustee | 03 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Colin Petersen | Trustee | 31 July 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £286.17k | £238.12k | £256.48k | £244.91k | £241.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £316.66k | £214.65k | £230.41k | £229.06k | £236.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £4.59k | £4.00k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 09 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 09 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 20 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 20 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 23 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 23 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 26 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 26 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1 JUNE 1997
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PEOPLE SUFFERING FROM ASTHMA AND OTHER BREATHING DIFFICULTIES IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF NEBULISERS FOR USE BY SUCH PERSONS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE SHAFTESBURY CENTRE
PERCY STREET
SWINDON
SN2 2AZ
- Phone:
- 01793524004
- Email:
- info@asthmarelief.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window