WESTBURY PARK, CLAYTON & REDGATE YOUTH CLUB
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Delivers sporting and educational recreational activities for children and young people between the ages of 7 years-17 years. Street dancing practice/tution, 5 a side indoor recreational football, guitar tuition.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 03 October 1997: Standard registration
- 17 November 2015: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- WESTBURY & CLAYTON YOUTH CLUB (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2010 | 31/08/2011 | 31/08/2012 | 31/08/2013 | 31/08/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.76k | £17.93k | £29.97k | £8.42k | £1.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.57k | £11.23k | £5.96k | £13.02k | £4.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2014 | 18 June 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2013 | 26 June 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2012 | 26 June 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2012 | 26 June 2013 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 14 AUGUST 1997
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CLUB IS TO HELP YOUNG PEOPLE (12-16 YEARS) ESPECIALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES, SO TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES THAT MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY
Area of benefit
BOROUGH OF NEWCASTLE UNDER LYME
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window