Accounts and annual returns GT FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1063741
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 11 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 11 days
Annual return 30 June 2023 06 September 2024 129 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 06 September 2024 129 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 15 May 2024 381 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 15 May 2024 381 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 27 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 27 April 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 23 August 2021 115 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 06 April 2021 On Time Download Open in new window