BLACK ARTS ALLIANCE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity was established as an information network for Black artists. The Black Artists Alliance has developed in to the largest pro-active and diverse representation of and for Black artists in the UK. Acts of Achievement remains BAA's most demanding project. While seeking to profile and expand the skills of its membership,communication and networking remains the core of its activity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 14 November 1997: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Montgomery | Trustee | 29 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Nazmat Hudda | Trustee | 29 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Aduwah Ankrah | Trustee | 26 March 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.97k | £9.35k | £3.54k | £18.98k | £12.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.12k | £6.04k | £5.81k | £15.50k | £9.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 23 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 22 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 04 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 09 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 31 MAY 1997 AS AMENDED 26 JULY 1997
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN PARTICULAR AFRICAN/CARIBBEAN/ASIAN COMMUNITY IN THE ART AND SCIENCE OF "BLACK ARTS" AND TO PROMOTE PUBLIC APPRECIATION THEREOF
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
33 Mullacre Road
MANCHESTER
M22 8DF
- Phone:
- 07757278188
- Email:
- baa@blackartists.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window