Financial history ROYAL SCOTTISH COUNTRY DANCE SOCIETY LEICESTER BRANCH

Charity Number: 1062639
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £9.06k £1.05k £9.18k £13.13k £8.94k
Total expenditure £9.30k £2.11k £5.37k £10.10k £9.29k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A