7TH ARMOURED DIVISION COMMEMORATIVE FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our aim is support families and veterans of the 7th Armoured Division, plus 4th and 7th Armoured Brigades (and their descendants) and to ensure our history is not a thing of the past and to educate future generations on the legacy of the British 7th Armoured Division, who fought in the North African Campaign and later Italy and North West Europe during the 1940s conflict and conflicts ever since.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 January 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 24 July 1997: Standard registration
- THE DESERT RATS ASSOCIATION (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Brigadier RETD Jonny Bourne OBE | Trustee | 31 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
Brigadier RETD James Woodham CBE MC | Trustee | 31 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
Maj Gen RETD PAUL NANSON CB CBE | Trustee | 09 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
Rodney Scott BEM | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/01/2020 | 30/01/2021 | 30/01/2022 | 30/01/2023 | 30/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.45k | £19.91k | £85.29k | £29.91k | £7.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.62k | £3.67k | £62.49k | £67.00k | £5.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 January 2024 | 27 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 January 2023 | 28 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 January 2023 | 28 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 January 2022 | 16 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 January 2022 | 25 January 2023 | 56 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 January 2021 | 08 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 January 2020 | 07 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST MADE 10 NOVEMBER 2006
Charitable objects
TO FOSTER PATRIOTISM AND GOOD CITIZENSHIP FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND PAST AND PRESENT MEMBERS OF THE DIVISION AND ITS CURRENT DESCENDENT BRIGADES, BY THE CREATION AND MAINTENANCE IN THETFORD FOREST, NORFOLK, OF A PERMANENT MEMORIAL TO THE BRAVERY OF THE 7TH ARMOURED DIVISION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
21 Beechgrove
Little Oakley
HARWICH
CO12 5NN
- Phone:
- 01255886544
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window