Accounts and annual returns SANDWICH ST MARY'S COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity Number: 1064576
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 24 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2022 01 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2021 18 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 18 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 07 April 2021 251 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required