Accounts and annual returns BURGOYNE HEIGHTS PLAYGROUP

Charity number: 1063353
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 7 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 7 days
Annual return 30 June 2023 12 March 2025 316 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 12 March 2025 316 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 05 March 2024 310 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 05 March 2024 310 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 16 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 16 March 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 26 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 26 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window