Financial history BURGOYNE HEIGHTS PLAYGROUP

Charity number: 1063353
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023
Total gross income £132.55k £96.45k £111.39k £79.77k £108.67k
Total expenditure £123.04k £104.78k £118.91k £88.59k £100.82k
Income from government contracts £113.69k £78.85k £93.97k £54.52k £84.98k
Income from government grants N/A £4.14k £8.18k £5.02k N/A