Governing document BIBLES FOR CHILDREN
Charity number: 1063200
Removed charity
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 27/05/1997 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 07/02/2005 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 27/06/2005 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 10/01/2012 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 09/09/2014 AS AMENDED ON 20 FEB 2018
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE UNDERSTANDING OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH THROUGH THE PROVISION OF CHILDREN'S BIBLES AND BIBLE RELATED MATERIAL TO CHILDREN IN PRIMARY SCHOOLS
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.