THE BROUGHTON GIFFORD AND HOLT YOUTHWORK PROJECT

Charity number: 1065451
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To help and educate young people through their leisure time activities in particular by the provision of youth work so as to develop their physical, mental and spiritual capacities that they may grow to full maturity as individuals and members of society and that their conditions of life may be improved. Regular meetings held with youth workers to assess work undertaken and resources needed.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £3,074
Total expenditure: £3,794

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Human Resources
Where the charity operates:
  • Wiltshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 November 1997: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev ANDREW ERIC EVANS Chair
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HOLT ST KATHARINE
Received: On time
THE MATHETES TRUST
Received: On time
Ronald Palmer Trustee 06 July 2021
BRADFORD ON AVON AND DISTRICT LINK
Received: On time
PAUL ANTHONY WILTSHIRE Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £3.97k £2.50k £2.54k £2.20k £3.07k
Total expenditure £8.34k £6.73k £3.55k £2.58k £3.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 21 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 12 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 02 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 01 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 22 March 2021 50 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
398 Ham Green
Holt
TROWBRIDGE
Wiltshire
BA14 6PX
Phone:
07971865511
Website:

No information available