Financial history LUCKY DUCKS

Charity number: 1064492
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £7.59k £4.63k £3.53k £8.34k £4.17k
Total expenditure £6.28k £4.51k £6.63k £4.59k £4.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A