LUCKY DUCKS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide childcare and education to children aged 2 1/2 to 5 years old.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Northumberland
Governance
- 19 September 1997: Standard registration
- 16 January 2025: Funds received from 1046327 THE RED BALLOON PRE-SCHOOL GROUP
- LUCKY DUCKS PRE SCHOOL SCREMERSTON (Working name)
- SCREMERSTON PRE-SCHOOL (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dorothy Purvis | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Beverley Sprot | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hayley Evans | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
SHIRLEY HOLLEYWELL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.59k | £4.63k | £3.53k | £8.34k | £4.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.28k | £4.51k | £6.63k | £4.59k | £4.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 22 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 23 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 17 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 05 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 3 JULY 1997 AS AMENDED 30TH MAY 2002
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION AND DEVELOPMENT OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
SCREMERSTON COUNTY FIRST SCHOOL
SCREMERSTON
BERWICK-UPON-TWEED
TD15 2RB
- Phone:
- 01289307536
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window