FRIENDS OF OSWALD ROAD SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fundraising for Oswald Road Primary School
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 09 September 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Manchester City
Governance
- 24 June 1997: Standard registration
- F.O.R.S. (Working name)
- FORS (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elizabeth Lehan | Trustee | 16 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Abigail Bury | Trustee | 13 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christina Willson | Trustee | 14 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gavin Simpson | Trustee | 30 March 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 09/09/2020 | 09/09/2021 | 09/09/2022 | 09/09/2023 | 09/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.54k | £20.15k | £16.14k | £15.84k | £14.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £40.07k | £7.13k | £30.30k | £10.59k | £18.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 09 September 2024 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 09 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 09 September 2023 | 01 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 09 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 09 September 2022 | 14 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 09 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 09 September 2021 | 12 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 09 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 09 September 2020 | 09 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 09 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22 MAY 1997
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Oswald Road Primary School
Longford Road
Chorlton Cum Hardy
MANCHESTER
M21 9PL
- Phone:
- +447872643870
- Email:
- oswaldrdpta@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window