FIRST CHURCH OF CHRIST, SCIENTIST, BEDFORD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
First Church of Christ, Scientist, Bedford is organised to promote the understanding and demonstration of the truth as set forth in the Bible and interpreted in "Science and Health with Key to the Scriptures" by Mary Baker Eddy, the Discoverer and Founder of Christian Science.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bedford
- Central Bedfordshire
Governance
- 04 September 1997: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nichola Joy Engledow | Trustee | 08 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
GEORGE ALBERT CHAPLIN | Trustee | 08 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jane Audrey Searle | Trustee | 31 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Chaplin | Trustee | 31 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Ann Smith | Trustee | 19 February 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33.57k | £47.35k | £40.92k | £47.56k | £18.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £33.08k | £35.93k | £52.17k | £50.64k | £20.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND BY-LAWS ADOPTED 15 FEBRUARY 2007.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE UNDERSTANDING AND DEMONSTRATION OF THE TRUTH AS SET FORTH IN THE BIBLE AND INTERPRETING IN SCIENCE AND HEALTH WITH THE KEY TO THE SCRIPTURE BY MARY BAKER EDDY , THE DISCOVER AND FOUNDER OF CHRISTIAN SCIENCE.
Area of benefit
BEDFORDSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
First Church Of Christ Scientist
84 Kimbolton Road
BEDFORD
MK40 2PD
- Phone:
- 01234 352914
- Email:
- fccsbedfordclk@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window