Accounts and annual returns THE BEN HARDWICK FUND

Charity number: 1062554
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2022 23 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2021 24 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2020 22 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2019 20 September 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 Not Required