Financial history AMAZING LIGHT GOSPEL

Charity number: 1067953
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £9.10k £6.80k £7.10k £720 £6.10k
Total expenditure £8.50k £7.20k £7.90k £650 £6.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A