SHARE (DEWSBURY)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides advise, information and arrange of service provision for children and adults with learning disabilities and their parents and carers. To include day services community outreach leisure schemes and children's fun clubs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2007
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Kirklees
Governance
- 06 June 1997: Standard registration
- 19 September 2013: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £255.16k | £243.82k | £261.73k | £286.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £238.60k | £238.80k | £255.63k | £240.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 1 MAY 1997 AS AMENDED 06 DECEMBER 2006
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF ADULTS AND CHILDREN WITH LEARNING DIFFICULTIES RESIDING WITHIN THE DISTRICT OF KIRKLEES, (WHICH SHALL BE KNOWN AS THE AREA OF BENEFIT) AND IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT LIMITING THE FOREGOING, BY THE FOLLOWING MEANS: (A) BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF SUCH PERSONS, IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; (B) BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE AND SUPPORT TO THE PARENTS, GUARDIANS, FOSTER PARENTS AND OTHER CARERS FOR SUCH PERSONS IN THE FORM OF A TELEPHONE HELP LINE, AND INFORMATION CONCERNING ANY ASPECT OF DEALING WITH THE PROBLEMS ARISING FROM DISABLEMENT; (C) BY ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC CONCERNING THE DISABLED AND THEIR PLACE IN THE COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
DISTRICT OF KIRKLEES.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window