DR TOPHAM'S RESEARCH FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Gastro-Intestinal and Liver Cancer research
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 May 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Surrey
Governance
- 14 October 1997: Standard registration
- BRIGHT (Working name)
- Investment
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr ALEXANDRA STEWART | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Dr Adam Frampton | Trustee | 07 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Judith Moore | Trustee | 04 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Alexander Horton | Trustee | 28 November 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/05/2023 | 05/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £148.56k | £43.55k | £100.28k | £57.67k | £98.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £84.29k | £284.90k | £70.98k | £173.22k | £135.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 May 2024 | 01 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 May 2024 | 01 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 May 2023 | 05 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 May 2023 | 05 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 31 March 2021 | 54 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 31 March 2021 | 54 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 1 MAY 1997 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 11 OCT 2018
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH AND THE SAVING OF LIVES BY PROMOTING RESEARCH INTO THE CAUSES AND TREATMENT OF CANCER AND PUBLISHING THE USEFUL RESULTS THEREOF AND BY THE PROVISION OF EQUIPMENT FOR CANCER SURGERY, TREATMENT AND RESEARCH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Dr Alex Stewart
Royal Surrey Hospital
Egerton Road
GUILDFORD
Surrey
GU2 7XX
- Phone:
- 07920774131
- Email:
- info@bright-research.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window