CROYDON REFUGEE DAY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Halls at West Croydon Baptist Church are available on Tuesday mornings for a 'drop in' service and for socialising on Wednesday mornings. Food, clothes, footwear, toiletries and household goods are distributed to local asylum seekers and refugees. A help desk is available to assist with administrative queries. Children of asylum seeker families are assisted in obtaining places in local schools.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £7,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
70 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Croydon
Governance
- 18 September 1997: Standard registration
- REFUGEE DAY CENTRE WEST CROYDON (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RODERICK IAN NEIL MACLEOD | Chair | 15 September 2010 |
|
|
||||
Linda Margaret Fox | Trustee | 16 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Rev Densel Larbi | Trustee | 28 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rosanna Miriam Edser | Trustee | 18 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ivanka Elizabeth Lennon | Trustee | 18 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Bridgette Nettleford | Trustee | 04 June 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.16k | £29.25k | £62.74k | £42.29k | £91.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.19k | £21.20k | £39.18k | £51.90k | £46.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £5.00k | £5.00k | £7.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 September 2022 | 220 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 08 September 2022 | 220 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 February 2021 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 15/04/1997 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 27/03/2013 as amended on 23 May 2014
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE AND ASSIST IN THE RELIEF OF REFUGEES WHO ARE IN NEED BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES WITHIN A DAY CENTRE.
Area of benefit
CROYDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
WEST CROYDON BAPTIST CHURCH
WHITEHORSE ROAD
CROYDON
CR0 2JH
- Phone:
- 02086894527
- Website:
-
croydonrefugeedaycentre.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window