Accounts and annual returns COLCHESTER GATEWAY CLUBS

Charity number: 1063731
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 18 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 18 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2023 31 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 31 March 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2022 06 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 06 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2021 11 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 11 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2020 25 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 25 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window