Financial history BOROUGHBRIDGE PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1063306
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/08/2024
Total gross income £0 £0 £1.92k £5.66k £6.86k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £1.69k £8.84k £7.28k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A