Accounts and annual returns DUDLEY HIV AND AIDS SUPPORT GROUP

Charity number: 1064695
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2007 04 October 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 04 October 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2006 11 January 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 19 January 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2005 31 January 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 31 January 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2004 19 January 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 19 January 2005 On Time