Accounts and annual returns THE HUXTABLE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1062575
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 05 April 2010 04 February 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2010 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2009 04 February 2011 364 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2009 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2008 Not submitted