FRONCYSYLLTE MALE VOICE CHOIR

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Singing in concerts to help organisations raise money for their charity and singing to the general public.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
65 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 01 May 1998: Standard registration
- 11 February 2025: Funds received from 502198 COR MEIBION ORFFIWS, RHOSLLANERCHRUGOG (THE ORPHEU...
- FRON CHOIR (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Thomas Jones | Chair | 08 February 2024 |
|
|||||
John Chapman | Trustee | 30 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Jones | Trustee | 30 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
MR Roger Williams | Trustee | 30 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Howard Bourne | Trustee | 30 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Robert Keith Williams | Trustee | 30 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Robert Morgan Edwards | Trustee | 31 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Ray Williams | Trustee | 31 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Leigh Mason | Trustee | 20 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN WINN | Trustee | 31 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
GEOFFREY PHILLIP DAVIES | Trustee | 17 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
ALLAN DAVID SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CYRIL JONES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £60.63k | £7.92k | £18.84k | £28.74k | £63.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £95.42k | £18.22k | £23.47k | £34.30k | £46.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 06 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 06 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1980 AS AMENDED 24 OCTOBER 1983, 28 OCTOBER 1985, 17 NOVEMBER 1988, 1 NOVEMBER 1993, 31 OCTOBER 1994 AND 23 MARCH 1998 as amended on 31 Jan 2019 as amended on 31 Jan 2019
Charitable objects
THE STUDY AND PRACTICE OF CHORAL MUSIC IN ORDER TO FOSTER PUBLIC KNOWLEDGE AND APPRECIATION OF SUCH MUSIC BY MEANS OF PUBLIC PERFORMANCE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 Liverpool Road West
OSWESTRY
Shropshire
SY11 1BJ
- Phone:
- 01691770912
- Email:
- secretary@fronchoir.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window