THE GREATER NOAKHALI ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 04 November 1997: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 3 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 3 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 368 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 368 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 734 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 734 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1099 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1099 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1464 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1464 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 4TH SEPTEMBER 1997
Charitable objects
PRINCIPALLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, FOR THE BENEFIT OF ANY PERSON OF GREATER NOAKHALI ORIGIN AND THEIR DESCENDANTS, WHEREVER IN THE WORLD HE OR SHE MAY BE RESIDING, FOR THE PURPOSE OF CARRYING OUT SUCH OF THE THE FOLLOWING PURPOSE AS ARE CHARITABLE (A) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, ISOLATION AND DISTRESS; (B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE FOR THEIR EDUCATION AND THEIR DEPENDANTS; (C) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PROTECTION OF HEALTH; (D) THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE OCCUPATIONS IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITHIN THE MEANING OF THE RECREATIONAL CHARITIES ACT 1958 AND AS LIMITED IN THAT ACT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
- No information available
- Phone:
- No information available
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window