ETERNAL LIFE MINISTRIES INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1069831
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Religious activities

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 28 March 2024

Total income: £215,055
Total expenditure: £158,816

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout London

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 June 1998: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • ETERNAL LIFE MINISTRIES (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Moses Ayinla Trustee 01 December 2024
None on record
Dr Augustine Edobor Arimoro AA Trustee 20 December 2020
None on record
Blessing Ikuga Trustee 01 June 2016
None on record
Victor Akpojivi Trustee 01 June 2016
None on record
REVEREND DUKE IMAJEMITE Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/03/2020 28/03/2021 28/03/2022 28/03/2023 28/03/2024
Total gross income £48.44k £49.79k £150.44k £41.12k £215.06k
Total expenditure £49.14k £49.67k £125.22k £73.74k £158.82k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 March 2024 23 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 March 2024

(These accounts
have been qualified)

23 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 March 2023 23 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 March 2023 23 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 March 2022 17 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 March 2022 17 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 March 2021 28 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 March 2021

(These accounts
have been qualified)

28 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 March 2020 27 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 March 2020 27 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
727 Old Kent Road
London
SE15 1JL
Phone:
02072779313
Website:

No information available