JEREMIAH'S JOURNEY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We offer support and information to children and their families who have experienced or are anticipating the death of someone special. We operate in Plymouth and the immediate surrounding area. The main part of our work is to offer a short term therapeutic group programme for bereaved children (5-18 years) and their parents/carers. Some individual and family support is available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Cornwall
- Devon
- Plymouth City
Governance
- 05 November 1999: Standard registration
- 14 November 2012: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2008 | 30/06/2009 | 30/06/2010 | 30/06/2011 | 30/06/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £114.36k | £119.17k | £105.96k | £134.44k | £100.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £69.97k | £118.76k | £89.44k | £119.42k | £85.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2012 | 25 September 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2012 | 25 September 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2011 | 07 March 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2011 | 07 March 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2010 | 08 April 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2010 | 19 April 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2009 | 27 January 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2009 | 28 January 2010 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 19 AUGUST 1999 AS AMENDED BY DEED OF VARIATION DATED 21 JUNE 2004
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE EMOTIONAL, PSYCHOLOGICAL AND SPIRITUAL SUPPORT FOR CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE EXPERIENCING THE DEATH OR ANTICIPATED DEATH OF A RELATIVE OR 'SIGNIFICANT OTHER'.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE DEVON (PLYMOUTH, SOUTH HAMS WEST DEVON) AND CORNWALL (SOUTH EAST CORNWALL)
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window