HAMMERWICH YOUTH AND COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Accommodate Hammerwich Scouts, Burntwood Singers, Parents and Toddlers group, several dance classes, Church socials, Hammerwich Environment group, occasional lectures and small parties.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 30 July 1997: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DOROTHY NICHOLL | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Derek Lamb | Trustee | 21 April 2012 |
|
|||||
LYNN BURNS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ELEANOR SHARP | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MICHAEL HARVEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr Robert Sharp | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.98k | £5.92k | £6.97k | £10.12k | £24.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.90k | £3.58k | £4.69k | £8.42k | £23.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 04 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 3 MARCH 1997
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF HAMMERWICH, AS A YOUTH CENTRE AND VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
PARISH OF HAMMERWICH
Contact information
- Address:
-
60 BURNTWOOD ROAD
HAMMERWICH
BURNTWOOD
WS7 0JW
- Phone:
- 01543673576
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window