SWANS TRUST (SHAFTESBURY)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Community Development Charity which supports the development of start up businesses and the activities that provide economic ,well being, cultural and environmental benefit in Shaftesbury and the surrounding area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Dorset
Governance
- 01 August 1997: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Francis Wilkinson | Trustee | 19 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Jane Belissa Beattie | Trustee | 15 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Peter Mills | Trustee | 21 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Leslie Goodwin | Trustee | 30 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
DR Richard Tippins | Trustee | 04 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
JOHN PARKER | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £50.29k | £85.12k | £46.38k | £41.45k | £47.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £66.31k | £49.60k | £26.05k | £34.88k | £40.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £42.82k | £9.53k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 04 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 12 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 12 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 12 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 17 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 17 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 20 FEBRUARY 1997
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF NORTH DORSET: INCLUDING IMPROVING THE TOWN OF SHAFTESBURY; PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION; PROMOTION AND PRESERVATION OF STANDARDS OF CRAFTSMANSHIP; PRESERVATION OF BUILDINGS OF CONSTRUCTIONAL OR ARCHITECTURAL MERIT; ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION RELEVANT TO EMPLOYMENT; AND SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES BENEFICIAL TO THE PUBLIC: FOR FULL DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3
Area of benefit
NORTH DORSET PARTICULARLY SHAFTESBURY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit1/2 Swans Yard
High Street
Shaftesbury
SP7 8JQ
- Phone:
- 01747850944
- Email:
- info@swanstrust.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window