YOUTH IN ROMSEY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity provides a facility for the young people of Romsey to meet in safe conditions and obtain advice and information about a wide variety of subjects from a range of service providers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £103,784 from 1 government contract(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hampshire
Governance
- 25 August 1998: Standard registration
- Youth in Romsey. A.K.A. working name Youth in Romsey Project (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alison Margaret Fenton Farrell | Trustee | 28 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robert John Garlike | Trustee | 09 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jane Elspeth Christine Thompson | Trustee | 21 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
IAN MCNEIL RICHARDS | Trustee | 12 March 2008 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £75.87k | £96.21k | £108.63k | £164.36k | £194.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £91.61k | £81.64k | £104.68k | £150.96k | £169.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £103.78k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £8.47k | £92.75k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 04 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 15 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 11 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 23RD APRIL 1997.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PERSONS LIVING IN THE ROMSEY AREA AND DISTRICT SO THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND AS MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND SO THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED, AND TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN A BUILDING (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE CENTRE") FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES, CLASSES, THE OBTAINING OF ADVICE AND OTHER FORMS OF LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THOSE YOUNG PERSONS.
Area of benefit
ROMSEY AREA AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Youth in Romsey
Southampton Road
ROMSEY
SO51 8AF
- Phone:
- 01794500581
- Email:
- info@yir.org.uk
- Website:
-
yir.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window