Accounts and annual returns THE NEWMARKET BYERLY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1068592
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2008 09 October 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2007 11 March 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2006 05 March 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2005 17 February 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2005 17 February 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2004 13 April 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2004 Not Required