Financial history Reaching Out Youth Adult Disabilities

Charity Number: 1070795
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £10.07k £8.15k £5.23k £13.81k £20.19k
Total expenditure £12.24k £9.13k £25.50k £19.04k £12.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A