Trustees Reaching Out Youth Adult Disabilities
Charity Number: 1070795

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SHOSHANA FOSTER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Bethany jane Gardiner | Trustee | 02 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Olivia Evans | Trustee | 28 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael Mumford | Trustee | 02 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Julian Reindrop | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Evans | Trustee | 15 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Wyn Hawkins | Trustee | 15 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
Michael Mitford | Trustee | 01 June 2010 |
|
|
||||
Jean Mitford | Trustee | 01 June 2009 |
|
|
||||
SHARON EVANS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.