BRITISH ORTHOPAEDIC ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Annual Congress & educational courses for members, curriculum development for all T&O trainees, provision of website for members & public. Research grants, professional practice publications. Regular communications with Government, it's agencies, allied bodies, patient groups, related international bodies etc.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£3,047,890
Donations and legacies | £67.06k | |
Charitable activities | £2.78m | |
Other trading activities | £62.75k | |
Investments | £140.63k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£3,333,080
Raising funds | £202.07k | |
Charitable activities | £3.13m | |
Other | £0 |
£185,394 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £202.07k | |
Charitable expenditure | £3.13m |
People

16 Employee(s)
19 Trustee(s)
56 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 2 |
£90k to £100k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 11 October 1999: Standard registration
- BOA (Working name)
- JOINT ACTION (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Leela Biant | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|||||
Ajay Malviya | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|||||
Sebastian Dawson-Bowling | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rhidian Morgan-Jones | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Professor Peter Giannoudis | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
vikas khanduja | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Professor Dominic Meek | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Professor benjamin ollivere | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
andrea sott | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Banaszkiewicz | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Deepa Bose | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|||||
Paul Francis Buckley | Trustee | 22 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mark Andrew Michael Stephen Leigh | Trustee | 21 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Hiro Tanaka | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Amar Rangan | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ian McNab | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Manktelow | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Fergal Monsell | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Simon Hodkinson | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.39m | £2.63m | £3.14m | £3.68m | £3.05m | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.33m | £2.46m | £2.78m | £3.95m | £3.33m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £365.55k | £153.90k | £259.14k | £210.39k | £67.06k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £7.32k | £7.95k | £57.87k | £0 | £62.75k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £2.88m | £2.36m | £2.71m | £3.30m | £2.78m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £136.26k | £110.93k | £108.72k | £105.66k | £140.63k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £66.44k | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £315.78k | £100.14k | £207.09k | £146.18k | £8.91k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £3.19m | £2.22m | £2.56m | £3.77m | £3.13m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £139.54k | £111.79k | £100.82k | £148.90k | £202.07k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £285.37k | £333.09k | £310.43k | £282.60k | £309.60k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £112.25k | £183.24k | £58.62k | £126.19k | £211.55k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £35.10k | £47.82k | £36.29k | £45.40k | £50.97k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £126.14k | £116.89k | £26.76k | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £196.94k | £94.54k | £18.40k | £27.97k | £47.86k | |
|
Long-term investments | £4.14m | £4.18m | £4.46m | £3.81m | £4.11m | |
|
Other assets | £2.49m | £2.74m | £3.52m | £3.28m | £2.79m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £629.08k | £690.50k | £940.84k | £891.26k | £821.69k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 14 November 2024 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 14 November 2024 | 14 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 January 2024 | 66 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 05 January 2024 | 66 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 12 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 05 November 2020 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 05 November 2020 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 12TH DECEMBER 1997 AND CHARITY COMMISSION SCHEME DATED 4TH MAY 2001. as amended on 16 Sep 2020 as amended on 22 Sep 2021 as amended on 21 Sep 2022 as amended on 20 Sept 2023
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF THE SCIENCE, ART AND PRACTICE OF ORTHOPAEDIC SURGERY WITH THE AIM OF BRINGING RELIEF TO PATIENTS OF ALL AGES SUFFERING FROM THE EFFECTS OF INJURY OR DISORDERS OF THE MUSCULOSKELETAL SYSTEM.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- 11 October 1999 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
38-43 LINCOLNS INN FIELDS
LONDON
WC2A 3PE
- Phone:
- 02074056507
- Email:
- secretary@boa.ac.uk
- Website:
-
boa.ac.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window