THE DEREK RAPHAEL CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Donation of funds to charitable institutions.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 16 July 1997: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew David Raphael | Trustee | 19 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
Peter Raphael | Trustee | 19 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
ENID MARY RAPHAEL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £46.02k | £848.26k | £34.75k | £43.78k | £35.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £118.90k | £133.83k | £176.33k | £151.04k | £188.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £848.26k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £133.83k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £4.76k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £129.06k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 13 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 06 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 30 JUNE 1997
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE CAPITAL AND INCOME OF THE TRUST FUND UPON TRUST AS TO THE INCOME, AND ALL OR SUCH PART OR PARTS OF THE CAPITAL AS THE FOUNDER MAY BY NOTICE IN WRITING TO THE TRUSTEES DETERMINE, FOR OR TOWARDS SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE FOUNDER MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BY A LIKE NOTICE DIRECT, PARTICULARLY, BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN THE ARTS BY THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF AN EXHIBITION OF MODERN BRITISH ART, AND TO MAKE DONATIONS TO SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTION OR INSTITUTIONS, AT SUCH TIME OF TIMES AND IN SUCH MANNER AS THE FOUNDER MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BY A LIKE NOTICE DIRECT. WHERE THE FOUNDER HAS NOT BY 5 APRIL IN THE INCOME TAX YEAR FOLLOWING THAT IN WHICH THE INCOME ARISES GIVEN A DIRECTION WHICH FULLY DISPOSES OF THE INCOME, THEN SUCH INCOME SHALL BE DISPOSED OF IN ACCORDANCE WITH SUB-CLAUSE 3.2. [2] SUBJECT TO AND IN DEFAULT OF ANY DIRECTION UNDER SUB-CLAUSE 3.1, AND INSOFAR AS ANY SUCH DIRECTION IS NOT EXHAUSTIVE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL APPLY THE INCOME FOR OR TOWARDS SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AND SHALL MAKE DONATIONS TO SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS, AT SUCH TIMES AND IN SUCH MANNERS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR DISCRETION THINK FIT. THE TRUSTEES MAY, IN THEIR DISCRETION, FOR THE PERIOD OF 21 YEARS FROM THE DATE OF THIS DEED , INSTEAD OF APPLYING THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY IN ANY YEAR, ACCUMULATE ALL OR ANY PART OF SUCH INCOME AT COMPOUND INTEREST BY INVESTING THE SAME AND THE RESULTING INCOME AT COMPOUND INTEREST BY INVESTING THE SAME AS AN ACCRETION TO AND AS PART OF THE CAPITAL OF THE CHARITY, SUCH ACCUMULATED INCOME IN ANY SUBSEQUENT YEAR AS IF THE SAME WERE INCOME OF THE CHARITY ARISING IN THEN CURRENT YEAR.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
8-10 Castle Street
CIRENCESTER
Gloucestershire
GL7 1QA
- Phone:
- 01285 885821
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window