BISHOP RAWSTORNE INTERNATIONAL LANGUAGE COLLEGE TRUST

Charity Number: 1063725
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The advancement of the education of the students of Bishop Rawstorne C of E Academy and the local and business community through the development of the academy, including the provision of facilities and educational items.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £12,193
Total expenditure: £782

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Lancashire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 31 July 1997: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Stephen John Gregson Trustee 17 November 2014
None on record
John Paul Cowley Trustee 01 March 2014
None on record
KATHLEEN COOPER Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £10.81k £12.08k £12.44k £10.61k £12.19k
Total expenditure £740 £778 £781 £780 £782
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 07 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 23 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 04 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 21 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 14 December 2021 167 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
BISHOP RAWSTONE LANGUAGE COLLEGE
HIGHFIELD ROAD
CROSTON
LEYLAND
PR26 9HH
Phone:
01772600349
Website:

No information available