THE WOLFE ROAD PROJECT LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To manage a Healthy Living Centre and community space for Foxhill Manage a revenue programme which includes the planning development and delivery of health and well being activities in partnership with local organisations for the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 23 October 1998: Standard registration
- 16 January 2013: Removed (Funds transferred (s.74))
- 16 January 2013: Funds transferred to 1093385 FOXHILL FORUM LIMITED
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £225.32k | £405.96k | £79.13k | £27.05k | £5.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £213.79k | £365.55k | £217.93k | £31.10k | £645.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 15 December 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 02 February 2011 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | 25 January 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 29 January 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | 29 January 2010 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 6 MARCH 1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 12 JUNE 1998
Charitable objects
SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF FOX HILL AND DISTRICT AS THE COUNCIL SHALL THINK FIT INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF LOW COST ACCOMMODATION AND RELATED SERVICES TO CHARITABLE ORGANISATIONS
Area of benefit
FOX HILL AND DISTRICT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window