Financial history TADPOLES PRE-SCHOOL LEARNING ALLIANCE

Charity number: 1062864
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £69.99k £58.87k £58.03k £68.45k £68.45k
Total expenditure £62.24k £58.96k £66.16k £66.24k £68.29k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A