Financial history BROXBOURNE CHURCH OF ENGLAND PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1062809
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £17.72k £15.77k £12.67k £20.87k £22.07k
Total expenditure £12.46k £31.36k £16.24k £6.20k £25.08k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A