WHITWORTH SOCIETY TRUST FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Awards have been made to students to attend the Annual Commemoration Meeting held in March in either Manchester or London and the Whitworth Society Summer Meeting held in July at a venue relevant to the incumbent President. Presentation of books and Registers to new Whitworth Scholars and Senior Scholars at the Institution of Mechanical Engineers' Vision Award Ceremony.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 10 September 1997: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DR BRIAN COAKER PHD WH SCH | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Laura Gilbert | Trustee | 21 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
James Henry Potten WhSch | Trustee | 15 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rachael Hoyle | Trustee | 05 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN DAVISON | Trustee | 21 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
DAVID GEORGE EAVES WHSCH MENG | Trustee | 26 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey Ward | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID CLAMP WH SCH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DR MARTIN COMER PHD WHSCH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.87k | £711 | £309 | £726 | £1.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £315 | £3.18k | £0 | £1.54k | £1.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 November 2024 | 25 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 November 2024 | 391 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 March 2023 | 125 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 February 2022 | 113 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 08 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 5 AUGUST 1949 AS AMENDED BY ORDER DATED 17 MAY 2006 AND RESOLUTION MADE UNDER SECTION 74(2) OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION OF PRIZES OR OTHER AWARDS IN COMMEMORATION OF THE WORK OF SIR JOSEPH WHITWORTH FOR STUDENTS OF SOME BRANCH OF MECHANICAL ENGINEERING WHO HAVE OBTAINED DISTINCTION IN THE EXAMINATIONS FOR NATIONAL SCHOLARSHIPS ORGANISED BY THE MINISTRY OF EDUCATION OR SUCH OTHER EXAMINATIONS AS THE WHITWORTH SOCIETY BY THEIR EXECUTIVE COUNCIL OR OTHER GOVERNING BODY MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DIRECT
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
35 Abbotts Ann Road
WINCHESTER
Hampshire
SO22 6NB
- Phone:
- 07519778095
- Email:
- llgilbert73@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window