THE MARGARET LITCHFIELD TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Grants provided for education, training and social purposes. Grants to registered charities or direct to individuals. Grants awarded worldwide.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ghana
- India
- Thailand
Governance
- 29 January 1998: Standard registration
- 16 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
- 09 October 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JONATHAN LITCHFIELD | Chair | 09 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
KATHERINE LITCHFIELD | Trustee | 09 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET REEDER | Trustee | 09 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
GRAEME LITCHFIELD | Trustee | 09 February 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.60k | £20.62k | £54.03k | £18.82k | £27.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 May 2025 | 182 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 March 2024 | 132 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 April 2023 | 172 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 March 2022 | 141 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 April 2021 | 171 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 25 MARCH 1997. AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DATED 31 OCTOBER 1997.
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE IN CASES OF NEED, HARDSHIP, DISTRESS OR ILL HEALTH PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF TWENTY ONE YEARS WHO ARE RESIDENT IN ENGLAND.
Area of benefit
ENGLAND
Contact information
- Address:
-
Tankards
Grindstone Handle Corner
Knaphill
Woking
GU21 2SD
- Phone:
- 07951001166
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window