ANIMAL FRIENDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1) To provide legal advice and assistance to members of the public and/or organisations who require such advice and assistance in connection with animal welfare and/or cruelty issues. 2) To investigate cases of alleged animal cruelty and to bring prosecutions in appropriate cases. 3) To assist individuals and organisation with foreign legal and legislative issues where those individuals or organis
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2020
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 18 September 1997: Standard registration
- ANIMAL LEGAL AID AND RESCUE MISSION (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Westley Pearson | Chair | 15 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Michael Thorpe | Trustee | 15 March 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 200 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 200 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 566 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 566 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 931 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 931 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 2 JUNE 1997 AS AMENDED BY DEED OF AMENDMENT 9 SEPTEMBER 1997
Charitable objects
1) TO PROVIDE LEGAL ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE TO MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC AND/OR ORGANISATIONS WHO REQUIRE SUCH ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE IN CONNECTION WITH ANIMAL WELFARE AND/OR CRUELTY ISSUES 2) TO INVESTIGATE CASES OF ALLEGED ANIMAL CRUELTY AND TO BRING PROSECUTIONS IN APPROPRIATE CASES 3) TO ASSIST INDIVIDUALS AND ORGANISATION WITH FOREIGN LEGAL AND LEGISLATIVE ISSUES WHERE THOSE INDIVIDUALS OR ORGANISATIONS ARE ENDEAVOURING TO RESCUE ANIMALS FROM CRUELTY OR TO RESCUE AND PROTECT BY LAWFUL MEANS INDIVIDUAL ANIMALS OR SPECIES WITHIN THEIR COUNTRY OF DOMICILE 4) TO PROVIDE EDUCATION WHERE APPROPRIATE BOTH IN THIS COUNTRY AND ABROAD UPON ANIMAL WELFARE ISSUES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Animal Friends Insurance Services L
Ltd
1 The Crescent
Sun Rise Way, Amesbury
SALISBURY
SP4 7QA
- Phone:
- 03445570300
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window