Trustees THE CLASSIC BOAT CENTRE TRUST
Charity number: 1064643

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Anthony Loftus | Trustee | 21 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Grace Arnold | Trustee | 21 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas John Coleman | Trustee | 13 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Francisco Figueiredo | Trustee | 11 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Lesley Victoria Von Schulthess Rechberg Preston | Trustee | 06 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dominic John Lawrence Fontana | Trustee | 02 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
William Sackville Gwynne Lawrence | Trustee | 16 November 2016 |
|
|||||
Mark Angus Thornycroft McNeill | Trustee | 08 April 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.