THE TWO WITNESSES OF JESUS CHRIST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity administers a Christian resource centre in Guildford Surrey providing help for those in spiritual and physical need
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 03 November 1997: Standard registration
- 08 March 2024: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 08 March 2024: Funds transferred to 1167111 WINTERSHALL CIO
No other names
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.11k | £16.44k | £10.14k | £17 | £973 | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.88k | £15.66k | £10.56k | £9.65k | £577.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 17 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 17 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 01 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 17 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 19 NOVEMBER 1996 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEEDS DATED 14 OCTOBER 1997 AND 7 DECEMBER 2006
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY SPREADING THE GOSPEL OF JESUS CHRIST PARTICULARLY RELATING TO HIS SECOND COMING, BY OFFERING HELP AND GUIDANCE TO THOSE IN SPIRITUAL OR OTHER NEED, AND BY TEACHING AND SUPPORTING THOSE ORDAINED TO DO THIS WORK.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window